MA H3721 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4923
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4923
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4923
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Lowell be authorized to fill vacancies in certain elective bodies in said city. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending Chapter 230 of the Acts of 1954
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4923 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2445 (Similar To) 2023-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2509
S2762 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2878
H4700 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 158 of the Acts of 2024
S2878 (Similar To) 2024-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2024
H4923 (Replaced by) 2024-08-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2762 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2878
H4700 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 158 of the Acts of 2024
S2878 (Similar To) 2024-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2024
H4923 (Replaced by) 2024-08-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3721 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3721.pdf |