MA H3722 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4450
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to nurses in psychiatric facilities. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To expand the role of nurses in psychiatric facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4450 |
2019-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1863 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H2311 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S103 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
H2320 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2175 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4450 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Reported, in part, by H1745
H2311 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S103 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
H2320 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2175 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4450 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Reported, in part, by H1745
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3722 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3722.pdf |