MA H3726 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H5
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 172 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 172 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Report of the
Title
Relative to vendor contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 172 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-11-03 | House | Enacted |
2011-11-03 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2011-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ethics and Rules) and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2011-09-26 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-26 | House | Substituted for H5 |
2011-09-26 | House | New draft of H5 |
Same As/Similar To
H5 (Replaces) 2011-09-26 - Amended by substitution of a new bill with the same title, see H3726
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3726 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17429&generalCourtId=1 |