MA H3731 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1893
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to acceptable health service training for psychologists
Title
Relative to acceptable health service training for psychologists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-07-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-13 | House | New draft of H1893 |
2013-11-01 | House | Pending new draft of H1893 |
2013-11-01 | House | Reported from the committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1893 (Replaces) 2013-11-13 - New draft substituted, see H3731
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3731 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3731.pdf |