MA H3735 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for the annual observance of the month of March as Massachusetts maple month and designating pure Massachusetts maple syrup as the official sweetener of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Providing for the Annual Observance of the Month of March as Massachusetts Maple Month and Designating Pure Massachusetts Maple Syrup as the Official Sweetener of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill, H4246 |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third |
2017-12-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-12-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-12-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-12-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-06-01 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3735 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3735.pdf |