MA H3740 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge on County Street in the city of Attleboro as the Lynn Goodchild and Shawn Nassaney September 11th Memorial Bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the city of Attleboro as the Lynn Goodchild and Shawn Nassaney 9/11 Remembrance Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-03-19 | House | Enacted |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-01-12 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-12-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-12-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-12-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-11-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-09-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2011-09-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3740 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17289&generalCourtId=1 |