MA H3743 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 102 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 102 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the town of Stoneham to create a special fund for railroad right of way proceeds By Mr. Lewis of Winchester, a petition of Jason M. Lewis (by vote of the town) that the town of Stoneham be authorized to create a special fund for railroad right of way proceeds. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Stoneham to create a special fund for railroad right of way proceeds
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 102 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-05-08 | House | Enacted |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-02-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-01-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-01-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3743 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3743.pdf |