MA H3757 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Erica Amoako, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Erica Amoako, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-09-08 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2015-08-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2840 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - New draft substituted, see H4308
H1641 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2015
H3107 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
H2077 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3455 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1641 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2015
H3107 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
H2077 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3455 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3757 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3757.pdf |