MA H3760 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to municipal banking laws. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Modernizing Commonwealth and municipal banking laws to protect customers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4111 |
2015-11-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-10-08 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2015-09-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-09-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2015-08-06 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4111 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H948
H588 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H730 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
H919 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2160 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3310 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H588 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - Placed on file
H730 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
H919 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2160 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3310 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3760 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3760.pdf |