MA H3774 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town manager of the town of Dalton be authorized to appoint and remove members of the Dalton Redevelopment Authority. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for the appointment of members of the Dalton Redevelopment Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-07-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-07-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2067 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S2161
H4080 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2018
S2161 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2017
H4301 (Similar To) 2018-07-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2018
H4607 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2018
H4658 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 344 of the Acts of 2018
H4694 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4917 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
H4080 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2018
S2161 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2017
H4301 (Similar To) 2018-07-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2018
H4607 (Similar To) 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2018
H4658 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 344 of the Acts of 2018
H4694 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4917 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3774 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3774.pdf |