MA H3776 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to basing dispositional orders on the best interests of children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to basing dispositional orders on a child’s best interest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-08-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H3067 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4012 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1074 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1005 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H277 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
H230 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S1439 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2261
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4012 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1074 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1005 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1737 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H277 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
H230 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S1439 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2261
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S966 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3776 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3776.pdf |