MA H3778 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 291 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 291 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to validating the actions taken at the annual town election held in the town of Dudley.
Title
Validating the actions taken at the annual town election held in the town of Dudley
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 291 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-10-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-10-06 | House | Enacted |
2016-10-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-10-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-02-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-01-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-09-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3778 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3778.pdf |