MA H378 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the maximum age of enrollment By Mr. Dwyer of Woburn, a petition of James J. Dwyer and Gale D. Candaras for legisltion to review the present age limits for student enrollment in public schools . Education.
Title
Relative to the maximum age of enrollment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, April 17, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-08-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H378 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H378.pdf |