MA H3787 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S771
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pharmacy benefit managers reimbursements to pharmacies in the Commonwealth. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to pharmacy benefit managers reimbursements to pharmacies in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Accompanied S771 |
2021-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S771 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - New draft substituted, see S2651
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3787 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3787.pdf |