MA H3789 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting child sex dolls. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting child sex dolls
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] |
Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1487 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2315 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H1038 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1589 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1582 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2353 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4641
H581 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S860 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5263
S1370 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2263
S1049 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
H4339 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
H4554 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2022
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1711 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied S1083
H1907 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see H4554
H2315 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H1038 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1589 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1582 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2353 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4641
H581 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S860 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5263
S1370 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H2263
S1049 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
H4339 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
H4554 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2022
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1711 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied S1083
H1907 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see H4554
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3789 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3789.pdf |