MA H379 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the directors of educational collaboratives
Title
The directors of educational collaboratives
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-22 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2010-03-04 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 6/2 at 1:00 PM in Hearing Room A1 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00379.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00379.htm |