MA H3796 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H214
Note: Legislation replaced by H4042
Note: Legislation replaced by H4042
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on October 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the city of Northampton to issue five above quota annual all-alcohol restaurant licenses
Title
Authorizing the city of Northampton to issue five above quota annual all-alcohol restaurant licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4042 |
2016-02-29 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2015-10-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-07 | House | New draft of H214 |
2015-10-07 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H214 (Replaces) 2015-10-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3796
H4042 (Replaced by) 2016-05-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 109 of the Acts of 2016
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
H4042 (Replaced by) 2016-05-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 109 of the Acts of 2016
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3796 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3796.pdf |