MA H3801 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 263 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 263 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the conveyance of certain property by the county and town of Nantucket, notwithstanding the uniform procurement law. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the county and town of Nantucket to convey a certain parcel of land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | House | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 263 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #486 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2014-08-01 | House | Enacted 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 499) |
2014-07-31 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-03-27 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-12-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2013 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-12-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-11-27 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2013-09-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3801 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3801.pdf |