MA H3805 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2104
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-19 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-19 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Sannicandro of Ashland, for the committee on Higher Education, on House, No. 2104, a Bill making faculty sabbatical provisions at state universities consistent with other higher education institutions (House, No. 3805). November 10, 2011.
Title
Making faculty sabbatical provisions at state universities consistent with other higher education institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-19 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4295 |
2012-07-19 | House | Read third |
2012-07-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-11-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-11-10 | House | New draft of H2104 |
2011-11-10 | House | Reported from the committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2104 (Replaces) 2011-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3805
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3805 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17510&generalCourtId=1 |