MA H381 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2570
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to registered interior designers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to advancing the profession of commercial interior design
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2570 |
2021-07-07 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-07 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2021-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S218 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2570
S2570 (Replaced by) 2021-11-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2570 (Replaced by) 2021-11-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H381 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H381.pdf |