MA H3812 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the student loan debt relief tax credit. Revenue.
Title
Relative to student loan debt relief tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2411 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3812 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3812.pdf |