MA H3817 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-17 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3885
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-17 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3885
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Canton be authorized to use retired Canton police officers as special police officers for the purpose of performing certain police duties. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing retired police officers serving as special police officers in the town of Canton to serve until the age of 70
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-17 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3885 |
2017-08-17 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2017-08-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-08-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-08-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-07-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2017 from 11:00 AM-11:30 AM in B-1 |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-07-17 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3761 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3831 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2018
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
H4378 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4724
H4924 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3831 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2018
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
H4378 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4724
H4924 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3817 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3817.pdf |