MA H3826 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for James Cooney, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for James Cooney, an employee of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-01-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-01-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-01-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-01-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-12-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3826 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3826.pdf |