MA H3828 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 40 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 40 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement of Penny Harvey (House, No. 3730) ought to pass with an amendment substituting a bill with the same title (House, No. 3828). December 5, 2011.
Title
Relative to the retirement of Penelope Harvey
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 40 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-02-15 | House | Enacted |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2012-01-04 | Senate | Read and referred to the Senate committee on Ways and Means |
2011-12-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-08 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-12-08 | House | Substituted for H3730 |
2011-12-05 | House | Recommended new draft for H3730 |
2011-12-05 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3828 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17693&generalCourtId=1 |