MA H3833 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Mattapoisett to place a municipal fee on aquaculture licenses. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to shellfish aquaculture license fees in the town of Mattapoisett
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-04-30 | House | Enacted |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-04-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-03-15 | House | Read second and ordered third |
2012-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-03-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-02-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/07/2012 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2012-03-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-12-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-12-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3833 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17686&generalCourtId=1 |