MA H3833 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3609
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act amending the special legislation establishing the Acton community housing corporation
Title
Amending the special legislation establishing the Acton community housing corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-01-15 | House | Enacted |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-01-06 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-01-06 | House | New draft of H3609 |
Same As/Similar To
H3609 (Replaces) 2014-01-06 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3833
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3833 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3833.pdf |