MA H384 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4600
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish parity in funding for regional vocational school districts and traditional public school districts. Education.
Title
To promote fairness between traditional public schools and regional vocational schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4600 |
2015-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4600 (Replaced by) 2016-09-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H384 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H384.pdf |