MA H3848 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - Hearing scheduled for 03/06/2014 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - Hearing scheduled for 03/06/2014 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to updating the bottle bill (House, No. 3848).
Title
Relative to updating the bottle bill
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/06/2014 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3848 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3848.pdf |