MA H385 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4252
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to voting overseas. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to voting overseas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4252 |
2017-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H376 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H366 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H386 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2102 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4252 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H366 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H386 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2102 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4252 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H385 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H385.pdf |