MA H3852 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4781
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(with the approval of the mayor and municipal council) that the city of Attleboro be authorized to utilize “design build†phased construction approach for projects being undertaken as part of the federal economic stimulus initiative, notwithstanding the uniform procurement law
Title
To begin phased construction in Attleboro.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Bowles [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4781 | |
2009-03-30 | Senate concurred | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4781 (Replaced by) 2010-07-12 - Reported, in part, by H03011
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H3852 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=6580&generalCourtId=2 |