MA H3852 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3852). November 16, 2015.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jane Mihalich, an employee of the Department of Public Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-12-17 | House | Enacted |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-12-17 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-11-16 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2015-11-16 | House | Substituted for H3820 |
Same As/Similar To
H3093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2416 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H534 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H3091 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
H956 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4198
H4760 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4754 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
H2416 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H534 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H3091 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
H956 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4198
H4760 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4754 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3852 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3852.pdf |