MA H3860 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4273
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-17 - New draft substituted, see H4273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-17 - New draft substituted, see H4273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Fish and Game to exchange a certain parcel of land in the town of Shirley for another parcel land in said town. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Department of Fish and Game to exchange certain property in the town of Shirley for other property in the same town
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | House | New draft substituted, see H4273 |
2012-07-17 | House | Read second |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2012-07-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-07-16 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment substituting a bill with the same title, H4273 |
2012-02-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-01-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2012 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-12-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-12-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2011-12-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4273 (Replaced by) 2012-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 219 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3860 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17609&generalCourtId=1 |