MA H3869 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1947
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a lupus erythematosus study and registry
Title
To establish a lupus erythematosus study and registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-11-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-11-25 | House | New draft of H1947 |
2015-11-25 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1947 (Replaces) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3869
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3701 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S1993 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2074
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3701 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S1993 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2074
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3869 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3869.pdf |