MA H3874 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4754
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide funding by the Commonwealth for the Ayer, Lunenberg and Shirley School District
Title
To provide transitional funding for a new school region.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-14 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4754 | |
2010-05-20 | House concurred | |
2010-04-05 | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 4, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4754 (Replaced by) 2010-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H3874 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=6878&generalCourtId=2 |