MA H3878 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of licensed mental health professionals under certain insurance laws. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to increasing consumer access to licensed rehabilitation counselors
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-11-21 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 11/28/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-08-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2017-06-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2959 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3878 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3878.pdf |