MA H3885 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4367
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 266 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 266 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Newton be authorized to appoint retired police officers as special police officers notwithstanding the maximum age restrictions. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to special police officers in the city of Newton
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. John Lawn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-16 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 266 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-09-06 | House | Enacted |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-08-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-06-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-06-09 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Public Service |
2016-06-09 | House | Reported on a part of H4367 |
2016-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4367 |
2016-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/26/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-12-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4367 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Reported, in part, by H4012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3885 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3885.pdf |