MA H3885 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5220
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require public safety vehicles to be equipped with emergency thermal blankets. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Requiring public safety vehicles to be equipped with emergency thermal blankets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5220 |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5220 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5220 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3885 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3885.pdf |