MA H3888 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4611
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on August 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the rank of first lieutenant of the state police. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Establishing the rank of first lieutenant of the state police
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] | Rep. Claire Cronin [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
Rep. James Miceli [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4611 |
2016-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2016 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-12-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2015-08-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4611 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H649 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4652
H1039 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2730 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2279 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2278 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H649 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4652
H1039 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2730 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2279 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2278 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3888 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3888.pdf |