MA H3894 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the domestic stock life insurance company, known as The Savings Bank Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to life insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-01-29 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2017-12-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-12-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-12-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-12-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-08-31 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2017-08-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3391 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3199 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
S2016 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2363
H2969 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 367 of the Acts of 2018
H34 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H505 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2207 (Similar To) 2017-12-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3199 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
S2016 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2363
H2969 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 367 of the Acts of 2018
H34 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H505 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2207 (Similar To) 2017-12-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3894 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3894.pdf |