MA H390 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4364
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect certain students and clients of public or private institutions from inappropriate sexual contact by employees. The Judiciary.
Title
For public protection of our youth.
Sponsors
Rep. Geraldo Alicea [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Christine Canavan [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] |
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-31 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4364 |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, July 31, 2012 |
2012-06-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 8, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 27, 2012 |
2011-08-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4364 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H390 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8290&generalCourtId=1 |