MA H3903 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4256
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the accessibility of hearing aids. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To Provide Increased Access to Hearing Aids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4256 |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 17, 2012 |
2012-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, May 3, 2012 |
2012-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2012 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-01-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2011-12-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4256 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3903 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17627&generalCourtId=1 |