MA H391 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing more efficient wetlands. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Providing for more efficient wetlands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4544 |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1732 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S1762 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1714 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1843 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H2126 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
H4544 (Replaced by) 2018-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4749 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
S1762 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1862 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1714 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1843 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H2126 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
H4544 (Replaced by) 2018-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4749 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied H4756
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H391 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H391.pdf |