MA H3911 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4615
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Governor's amendment adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Governor's amendment adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Lunenburg be authorized to establish a means-tested senior citizen property tax exemption in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Lunenburg to establish a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | House | Governor's amendment adopted |
2024-06-06 | House | Governor's amendment considered (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading) |
2024-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2024-05-02 | House | For message, see H4615 |
2024-05-01 | Governor returned to the House with amendment | |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-04-22 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-21 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-12-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-12-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-11-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4615 (Replaced by) 2024-05-02 - See H3911
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3911 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3911.pdf |