MA H3917 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1179
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 31 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 31 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to payment for use of ambulance services (House, No. 3917). February 2, 2012
Title
Relative to payment for use of ambulance services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-08-09 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2012-08-09 | House | For message, see H4381 |
2012-08-07 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-07-30 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2384 |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Read second |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2012-05-07 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-04-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-02-02 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2012-02-02 | House | New draft of H1179 |
2012-02-02 | House | Reported from the committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1179 (Replaces) 2012-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3917
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3917 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17972&generalCourtId=1 |