MA H3917 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4348
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the lease of property at Essex North Shore Agricultural and Technical School. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing for the lease of property at Essex North Shore Agricultural and Technical School
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4348 |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-07-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, July 23, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 25, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday June 25, 2014) adopted, pending concurrence |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-05-27 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 29, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 18, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-03-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/27/2014 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4348 (Replaced by) 2014-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3917 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3917.pdf |