MA H3919 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the residency requirement for the executive assistant in the town of Hudson. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the residency requirement for the executive assistant in the town of Hudson
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-03-07 | House | Enacted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-09-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-08-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-08-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-08-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-08-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3921 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4296
H3920 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2021
H2673 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H2654 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3965
H3965 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2022
H4126 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2022
H4296 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3920 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2021
H2673 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3163 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - New draft substituted, see H4126
H2654 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3965
H3965 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2022
H4126 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2022
H4296 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3919 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3919.pdf |