MA H3934 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4364
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the reporting requirements of mortgages secured by residential property. The Judiciary.
Title
To increase transparency in the Massachusetts land record systems to protect the propertyrights of homeowners and businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-31 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4364 |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, July 31, 2012 |
2012-06-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 8, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 27, 2012 |
2012-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2012 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-01-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4364 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3934 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17758&generalCourtId=1 |