MA H3936 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 442 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 442 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Franklin Regional Retirement System to grant retirement benefits to Wendy Foxmyn. Public Service.
Title
Providing retirement benefits for an employee of western Massachusetts communities.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 442 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-28 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-12-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-08-06 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-07-31 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee, as changed and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-02-02 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-12-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3936 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17643&generalCourtId=1 |