MA H3937 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4090
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - New draft substituted, see H4090
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - New draft substituted, see H4090
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the appointment of certain designees to the Inspector General Council. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Allowing for the appointment of designees to the Inspector General Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | House | New draft substituted, see H4090 |
2014-05-19 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2014-05-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-05-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2014-05-19 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-05-19 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4090 |
2014-05-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-03-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/27/2014 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-05 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4090 (Replaced by) 2014-12-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2014v
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3937 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3937.pdf |