MA H3942 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3926
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Order adopted, see H3926
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Order adopted, see H3926
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Filed by Mr. Galvin of Canton. January 11, 2016.
Title
Special procedures for consideration of the House bill relative to substance use, treatment, education and prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | House | Order adopted, see H3926 |
2016-01-11 | House | Amendment adopted |
2016-01-11 | House | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2016-01-11 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3926 (Replaced by) 2016-01-13 - New draft substituted, see H3944
H1310 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1310 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3942 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3942.pdf |